NJ SCR156 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR186
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly urges DEP to adopt standards for certain drinking water contaminants as recommended by NJ Drinking Water Quality Institute.
Title
Strongly urges DEP to adopt standards for certain drinking water contaminants as recommended by NJ Drinking Water Quality Institute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR131 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR186 (Carry Over) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR186 (Carry Over) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee