NJ SCR55 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes inclusion of citizenship question in 2020 census; urges New Jersey Congressional Delegation to reject any measure directing Census Bureau to include question.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opposes inclusion of citizenship question in 2020 census; urges New Jersey Congressional Delegation to reject any measure directing Census Bureau to include question.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR121 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2018-04-12AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (49-22-0)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for ACR121
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (26-13)
2018-02-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR121 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by SCR55

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback