NJ SCR99 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR15
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature to extend civil service hiring preference to veterans who did not serve in time of war.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature to extend civil service hiring preference to veterans who did not serve in time of war.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR56 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR15 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
ACR15 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR99 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/99_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR99 |