NJ SJR108 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by AJR172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by AJR172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Thursday of third week of September of each year as "Food Waste Prevention Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates Thursday of third week of September of each year as "Food Waste Prevention Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by AJR172 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR172 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-6.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR108 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/108_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR108 |