NJ SJR112 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR16
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by AJR180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by AJR180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February in each year as "Career and Technical Education Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates February in each year as "Career and Technical Education Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by AJR180 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR112 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by AJR180
AJR180 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-33.
AJR180 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-33.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR112 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/112_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR112 |