NJ SJR115 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR155
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR25
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR25
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Pharmacogenomics Commission.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Pharmacogenomics Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
AJR181 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
AJR181 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading