NJ SJR12 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR86
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges federal government to assist with implementing positive train control technology on NJ railways.
Title
Urges federal government to assist with implementing positive train control technology on NJ railways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR86 (Carry Over) 2016-10-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee