NJ SJR125 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR13
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-29.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-29.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the second week of October of each year as "Obesity Care Week" in NJ.
Title
Designates the second week of October of each year as "Obesity Care Week" in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR169 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-29. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR169 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR125 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-29.
AJR169 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR125 (1R)
AJR169 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR125 (1R)