NJ SJR27 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR52
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Small Business Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates May of each year as "Small Business Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR61 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-13. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR61 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR52 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
AJR61 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by SJR27
AJR61 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by SJR27