NJ SJR47 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AJR102

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by AJR26 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates September of each year as "Youth Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates September of each year as "Youth Suicide Prevention Awareness Month" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateSubstituted by AJR26 (1R)
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR26 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
AJR102 (Carry Over) 2016-10-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback