NJ SJR55 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR118

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges U.S. Congress to pass Equal Rights Amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges U.S. Congress to pass Equal Rights Amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-03-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR88 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR118 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback