NJ SJR59 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR32
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Civil War Veterans Recognition Month," in honor of the Grand Army of the Republic and the Sons of Union Veterans of the Civil War.
Title
Designates May of each year as "Civil War Veterans Recognition Month," in honor of the Grand Army of the Republic and the Sons of Union Veterans of the Civil War.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR21 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR21 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-24. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR21 (1R) |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR21 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by SJR59
AJR32 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR32 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR59 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/59_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR59 |