NJ SJR67 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, JR-7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, JR-7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates May as "Lupus Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates May as "Lupus Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, JR-7. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for AJR74 | |
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR74 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by SJR67