NJ SJR67 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by AJR37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by AJR37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 21 of each year as "ASK Day" to promote children's health and gun safety.
Title
Designates June 21 of each year as "ASK Day" to promote children's health and gun safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by AJR37 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR37 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-13.
AJR121 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR121 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR67 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/67_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR67 |