NJ SJR83 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Title
Expresses support for United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-25. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-1) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR116 |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR116 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by SJR83
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR83 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/83_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR83 |