NJ SJR86 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Honors American Legion on 100th anniversary of its founding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honors American Legion on 100th anniversary of its founding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR101 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, JR-19.
2019-06-10AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2019-06-10AssemblySubstituted for AJR101
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR101 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by SJR86

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback