NJ SR119 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges NJ Dept. of Agriculture to promote gleaning and post gleaning information on website.
Title
Urges NJ Dept. of Agriculture to promote gleaning and post gleaning information on website.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR224 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR119 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/119_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR119 |