NJ SR126 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges CDC to adopt uniform data system to collect information on maternal mortality.
Title
Urges CDC to adopt uniform data system to collect information on maternal mortality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR226 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Filed with Secretary of State