NJ SR25 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR20
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress of United States to restore "net neutrality" in federal law.
Title
Urges President and Congress of United States to restore "net neutrality" in federal law.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR25 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR131 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AR131 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR25 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/25_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR25 |