NJ SR80 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges United States Congress to pass legislation to automatically enroll veterans for benefits they are entitled to in United States Department of Veterans Affairs system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges United States Congress to pass legislation to automatically enroll veterans for benefits they are entitled to in United States Department of Veterans Affairs system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2018-09-27SenateResolution Passed Senate (Voice)
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AR163 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback