NJ SR85 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes October 13, 2020 as "Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Recognizes October 13, 2020 as "Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (39-0) (Sweeney) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SR85 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR190 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AR190 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee