NJ SR93 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to pass and fund federal "Excellence in Mental Health and Addiction Treatment Expansion Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Congress to pass and fund federal "Excellence in Mental Health and Addiction Treatment Expansion Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2019-06-10SenateResolution Passed Senate (Voice)
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-08-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

AR237 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback