NJ SR96 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes President and Congress to eliminate existing restrictions on abortion access and reject Supreme Court nominees who would impose new limits on reproductive freedom.
Title
Memorializes President and Congress to eliminate existing restrictions on abortion access and reject Supreme Court nominees who would impose new limits on reproductive freedom.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (24-10) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Motion To Table (19-17) (Weinberg) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Kean) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-11) (Weinberg) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR181 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Filed with Secretary of State