NM HB137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County & Tribal Health Councils Act
Title
County & Tribal Health Councils Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 14 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | SIAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sent to SIAC - Referrals: SIAC/SPAC |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-02-18 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HHHC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |