NM HB151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (34-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (34-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Students Needs Assessments
Title
Indian Students Needs Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (34-5) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (44-21) |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Education |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] HSIVC |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to HSIVC and then to House Education |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |