NM HB195 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Products Act
Title
Tobacco Products Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-12 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-06 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to: HHHC/HTRC |
2020-01-27 | House | Printed |
2020-01-24 | House | Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=195&year=20 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/20%20Regular/bills/house/HB0195.pdf |