NM HB20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 230 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 230 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grow Your Own Teachers Act
Title
Grow Your Own Teachers Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 230 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-16 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:2 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-04 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-15 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |