NM HB202 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 104 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 104 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conservancy District Roads & Tort Immunity
Title
Conservancy District Roads & Tort Immunity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 104 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-18 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |