NM HB204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 126 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 126 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Soil Act
Title
Healthy Soil Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 126 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:6 |
2019-03-05 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-19 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-29 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HAWC/HAFC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |