NM HB207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surprise Billing Protection Act
Title
Surprise Billing Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-05 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |