NM HB237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 14 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extend University Police Officer Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend University Police Officer Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 14 - Feb. 4
2019-01-31SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0
2019-01-29SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-24SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2019-01-23HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
2019-01-22HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback