NM HB300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 131 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 131 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Electric Co-op Proxy Voting & Quorums
Title
Rural Electric Co-op Proxy Voting & Quorums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 131 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SFC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-25 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-31 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-21 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HSEIC |