NM HB312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 133 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Seizure & Disposition Of Forfeited Property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seizure & Disposition Of Forfeited Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 133 - Apr. 2
2019-03-15HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2019-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-03-12SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-07SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-26SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
2019-02-25HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:5
2019-02-22HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-02-18HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-22HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback