NM HB325 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Records Considered For Employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Records Considered For Employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2020-02-18HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:14
2020-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2020-02-14HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-11HouseReferred to: HSEIC
2020-02-11HousePrinted
2020-02-11HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-01-31HouseNot Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback