NM HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 194 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 194 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Restricted Housing Act
Title
Corrections Restricted Housing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 194 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:2 |
2019-03-03 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-18 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |