NM HB388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 109 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 109 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gender-free Restrooms
Title
Gender-free Restrooms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 109 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:23 N:15 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:12 |
2019-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-13 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-28 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |