NM HB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Ethics Commission Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Ethics Commission Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-04SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
2019-03-04HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:56 N:11
2019-02-28HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-24HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-11HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback