NM HB407 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 212 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Election Laws 50-year Tune-up

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Laws 50-year Tune-up

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 212 - Apr. 3
2019-03-12SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:2
2019-03-11SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
2019-03-07HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:8
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-03HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-18HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-29HouseSent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback