NM HB45 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes To Retiree Health Care Fund
Title
Changes To Retiree Health Care Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:11 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:11 |
2020-02-07 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-29 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-22 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HAFC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |