NM HB534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public-private Partnership Act
Title
Public-private Partnership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roberto Gonzales [D] | Rep. Patricia Lundstrom [D] | Sen. Michael Padilla [D] | Sen. Clemente Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2019-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-26 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-15 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-11 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HJC |