NM HB539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Social Work Licensure & Provision Changes
Title
Social Work Licensure & Provision Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:9 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to: HHHC/HLVMC |
2019-02-11 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |