NM HB58 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance For Artery Screening
Title
Health Insurance For Artery Screening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:6 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SFC |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:21 |
2019-02-01 | House | HCal: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-23 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |