NM HB651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 147 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 147 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Data Act
Title
Water Data Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Stefanics [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 147 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-16 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Failed to Pass in Senate |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-28 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HAFC |