NM HB70 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Coverage For Prosthetics
Title
Insurance Coverage For Prosthetics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:55 N:7 |
2019-02-12 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |