NM HB87 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-02 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-02 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence & Firearm Possession
Title
Domestic Violence & Firearm Possession
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-02 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:28 |
2019-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-05 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-29 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |