NM HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 263 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 263 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Coverage For Contraception
Title
Health Coverage For Contraception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 263 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:8 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:24 |
2019-02-05 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-23 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |