NM HJM9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use Of Tier 2 Funds For Loan Subsidization
Title
Use Of Tier 2 Funds For Loan Subsidization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0 |
2019-02-14 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC |