NM HJR10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Valencia County Land Sale
Title
Valencia County Land Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:1 |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-03-04 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-26 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HSEIC |