NM HJR4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eddy County Land Sale
Title
Eddy County Land Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2020-01-31 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |