NM SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 88 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 88 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Rights Notifications Online
Title
Water Rights Notifications Online
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 88 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-15 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |